Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/10/2019 at 00:52:17 (UTC).

CACH, LLC VS Yamel Salazar

Case Summary

On 03/31/2016 CACH, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Yamel Salazar. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8134

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH, LLC

Defendant

Yamel Salazar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kathryn Neuheisel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Dismissal, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Stipulation, Sub Type: Dismiss, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Summary, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Summary Judgment, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Summary Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: Notice of Service Re 26.1 Disclosure, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: Notice of Service Re 26.1 Disclosure, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less