Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/17/2019 at 16:17:41 (UTC).

CACH LLC VS MIKE POMERANTZ

Case Summary

On 12/20/2016 CACH LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MIKE POMERANTZ. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0361

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CACH LLC

Defendant

MIKE POMERANTZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kathryn Neuheisel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Release & Quash Writ, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Notice of Hearing on Garnishment, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Debtor, Sub Type: Hearing Request, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Attempted Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Judgment For: CACH LLC Judgment Against: MIKE POMERANTZ, Amount: $8,819.25, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Judgment For: CACH LLC Judgment Against: MIKE POMERANTZ, Amount: $800.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • Judgment For: CACH LLC Judgment Against: MIKE POMERANTZ, Amount: $161.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less