This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 03/01/2021 at 10:26:38 (UTC).

BILTMORE WATERFRONT LLC VS JENNIFER M STIREK Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/31/2020 BILTMORE WATERFRONT LLC filed an Other lawsuit against JENNIFER M STIREK. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Manistee Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Watts, Donald. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1848

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Manistee Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Watts, Donald

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BILTMORE WATERFRONT LLC

Defendants

KEITH J CREEL

JENNIFER M STIREK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Clark

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2021
  • HearingEvent: Evidentiary Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • HearingEvent: Evidentiary Hearing; Result: Reset

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: e-mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • HearingEvent: Eviction Action Hearing; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: BILTMORE WATERFRONT LLC Judgment Against: KEITH J CREEL Judgment Against: JENNIFER M STIREK, Amount: $3,101.84, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less