Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/07/2019 at 19:12:21 (UTC).

BILLY KRANTZ VS DONALD DEAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/22/2016 BILLY KRANTZ filed an Other lawsuit against DONALD DEAN. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Jayne, Clancy and Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3861

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Jayne, Clancy

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BILLY KRANTZ

Defendants

DONALD DEAN

MELANIE DEAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Carlton Casler

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Returned, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Vacate, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Appeal Notice of, Sub Type: Right to Appeal, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Eviction Action Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Complaint, Sub Type: Eviction Action Complaint, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2016
  • Judgment For: BILLY KRANTZ Judgment Against: DONALD DEAN Judgment Against: MELANIE DEAN, Amount: $7,241.60, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less