This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 04/11/2021 at 10:44:46 (UTC).

BIGLEOW ARIZONA LLC IV VS KIMBERLY HART

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 BIGLEOW ARIZONA LLC IV filed an Other lawsuit against KIMBERLY HART. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3584

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIGLEOW ARIZONA LLC IV

Defendant

KIMBERLY HART

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Hull

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • HearingEvent: Evidentiary Hearing; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Exhibit, Sub Type: Filed, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Exhibit, Sub Type: Filed, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • HearingEvent: Evidentiary Hearing; Result: Continued - Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Compel, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • HearingEvent: Eviction Action Hearing; Result: Judgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Judgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Waiving Court Costs, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: BIGLEOW ARIZONA LLC IV Judgment Against: KIMBERLY HART, Amount: $4,190.95, Type: Total Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Application for Waiver/Deferral, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Exhibit, Sub Type: Filed, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Counterclaim, Sub Type: Against Plaintiff(s), Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Eviction Action Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Complaint, Sub Type: Eviction Action Complaint, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less