This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 06/29/2020 at 13:41:13 (UTC).

BIGELOW ARIOZONA LLC VS CASEY MEYERS Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 BIGELOW ARIOZONA LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CASEY MEYERS. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7390

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIGELOW ARIOZONA LLC

Defendants

CASEY MEYERS

CASSIDY EICHEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Hull

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • HearingEvent: Eviction Action Hearing; Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: BIGELOW ARIOZONA LLC Judgment Against: CASEY MEYERS Judgment Against: CASSIDY EICHEL, Amount: $2,051.36, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Summons, Sub Type: Eviction Action, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less