This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/28/2019 at 00:43:42 (UTC).

BENJAMIN RASCON-ESCALANTE VS MARIA TERESA ROMERO

Case Summary

On 06/27/2017 BENJAMIN RASCON-ESCALANTE filed an Other lawsuit against MARIA TERESA ROMERO. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Hernandez, Jimmie and Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8170

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Hernandez, Jimmie

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENJAMIN RASCON-ESCALANTE

Defendants

MARIA TERESA ROMERO

RICARDO GONZALEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Zawtocki

Defendant Attorney

Gary Hudson

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order of Transfer, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Appearance, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Stipulation, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Subpoena duces tecum, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Continue, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Stipulation, Sub Type: Continue, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counterclaim, Sub Type: Against Plaintiff(s), Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Stipulation, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Acceptance of Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Moot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less