This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/20/2019 at 02:35:15 (UTC).

BCG EQUITIES LLC VS MARGARITA HALLAWAY

Case Summary

On 03/08/2017 BCG EQUITIES LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MARGARITA HALLAWAY. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Hernandez, Jimmie and Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4772

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Hernandez, Jimmie

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BCG EQUITIES LLC

Defendant

MARGARITA HALLAWAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles Bruen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: And Order, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Notice of Hearing on Garnishment, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Debtor, Sub Type: First Hearing Request, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Judgment For: BCG EQUITIES LLC Judgment Against: MARGARITA HALLAWAY, Amount: $5,330.67, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Judgment For: BCG EQUITIES LLC Judgment Against: MARGARITA HALLAWAY, Amount: $398.70, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Judgment For: BCG EQUITIES LLC Judgment Against: MARGARITA HALLAWAY, Amount: $160.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Judgment For: BCG EQUITIES LLC Judgment Against: MARGARITA HALLAWAY, Amount: $390.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less