This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/28/2019 at 05:21:49 (UTC).

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE VS MONICA L. CHIAGO

Case Summary

On 07/06/2017 BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE filed an Other lawsuit against MONICA L CHIAGO. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Hernandez, Jimmie and Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4057

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Hernandez, Jimmie

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE

Defendant

MONICA L. CHIAGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lindsey Lamey

Defendant Attorney

Mark Yonan

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Dismiss, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Dismissal With Prejudice, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Pre-Trial Conference Report, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Appearance, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Counterclaim, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less