This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 02/02/2020 at 11:46:01 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA VS DUC NGUYEN

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 BANK OF AMERICA filed an Other lawsuit against DUC NGUYEN. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, University Lakes Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Kissell, Tyler. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5022

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    University Lakes Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Kissell, Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA

Defendant

DUC NGUYEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vincent Creta

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Waive Appearance of Real Party in Interest, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Judgment on Pleadings, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Waiving Court Costs, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Application for Waiver/Deferral, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2019
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.