This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/27/2020 at 09:18:23 (UTC).

AVONDALE SIESTA POINTE LP VS ASHLEY CROSBY

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 AVONDALE SIESTA POINTE LP filed an Other lawsuit against ASHLEY CROSBY. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Agua Fria Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Guzman, Joe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7246

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Agua Fria Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Guzman, Joe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AVONDALE SIESTA POINTE LP

Defendant

ASHLEY CROSBY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott Williams

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • HearingEvent: Eviction Action Hearing; Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • JudgementJudgment For: AVONDALE SIESTA POINTE LP Judgment Against: ASHLEY CROSBY, Amount: $1,184.01, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Subpoena Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Summons, Sub Type: Issued, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Subpoena for Witness, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less