This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/01/2019 at 06:07:24 (UTC).

AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS RANDY ALLEN BOSTON Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2017 AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed an Other lawsuit against RANDY ALLEN BOSTON. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Agua Fria Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Guzman, Joe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4122

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Agua Fria Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Guzman, Joe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Defendants

RANDY ALLEN BOSTON

VANESSA R BOSTON

Garnishees

GENERAL DYNAMICS CORPORATION

HOME DEPOT INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Release Of Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Release Of Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Notice of Hearing on Garnishment, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Debtor, Sub Type: Hearing Request, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Application for Waiver/Deferral, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Waiving Court Costs, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Judgment For: AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. Judgment Against: RANDY ALLEN BOSTON Jr. Judgment Against: VANESSA R BOSTON, Amount: $10,278.07, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less