Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/05/2019 at 01:47:06 (UTC).

AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS PHILLIP ANTHONY BATRES

Case Summary

On 02/01/2018 AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed an Other lawsuit against PHILLIP ANTHONY BATRES. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ash, Cecil. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2726

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ash, Cecil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Defendant

PHILLIP ANTHONY BATRES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Judgment For: AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. Judgment Against: PHILLIP ANTHONY BATRES, Amount: $6,548.36, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less