This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 11:51:18 (UTC).

AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS JOHNETTA JACKSON

Case Summary

On 08/31/2017 AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed an Other lawsuit against JOHNETTA JACKSON. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3101

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Defendant

JOHNETTA JACKSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Judgment For: AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. Judgment Against: JOHNETTA JACKSON, Amount: $421.69, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Judgment For: AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. Judgment Against: JOHNETTA JACKSON, Amount: $744.76, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Judgment For: AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. Judgment Against: JOHNETTA JACKSON, Amount: $155.32, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less