This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/10/2019 at 09:14:54 (UTC).

AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES INC VS CLAIRE-ANNE DURHAM

Case Summary

On 09/18/2018 AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES INC filed an Other lawsuit against CLAIRE-ANNE DURHAM. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Mesa Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ash, Cecil. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2132

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ash, Cecil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

Defendant

CLAIRE-ANNE DURHAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Suspending Action Due to Bankruptcy, Result: Suspended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Filing of Bankruptcy, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • DocketEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketJudgment For: AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES INC Judgment Against: CLAIRE-ANNE DURHAM, Amount: $6,326.18, Type: Total Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less