This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/19/2019 at 22:03:15 (UTC).

AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. VS Christopher Domonique Chaney

Case Summary

On 02/28/2017 AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC filed an Other lawsuit against Christopher Domonique Chaney. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0170

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.

Defendant

Christopher Domonique Chaney

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Transfer From Small Claims to Civil, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Judgment For: AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. Judgment Against: Christopher Domonique Chaney, Amount: $349.77, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Judgment For: AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. Judgment Against: Christopher Domonique Chaney, Amount: $367.43, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Judgment For: AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. Judgment Against: Christopher Domonique Chaney, Amount: $191.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less