This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/31/2019 at 17:56:22 (UTC).

ASPIRE FINANCIAL HOLDINGS LLC VS LORIN MEANS

Case Summary

On 12/04/2017 ASPIRE FINANCIAL HOLDINGS LLC filed an Other lawsuit against LORIN MEANS. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9176

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASPIRE FINANCIAL HOLDINGS LLC

Defendant

LORIN MEANS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kyle Hallstrom

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Show Cause, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Application for Attorney Fees, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Alternative Method of Service, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Judgment For: ASPIRE FINANCIAL HOLDINGS LLC Judgment Against: LORIN MEANS, Amount: $2,525.13, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Judgment For: ASPIRE FINANCIAL HOLDINGS LLC Judgment Against: LORIN MEANS, Amount: $219.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Judgment For: ASPIRE FINANCIAL HOLDINGS LLC Judgment Against: LORIN MEANS, Amount: $390.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.