Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/16/2019 at 23:26:21 (UTC).

ARIZONA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION VS RUPERT ARZOLA Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2016 ARIZONA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed an Other lawsuit against RUPERT ARZOLA. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3676

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARIZONA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendants

RUPERT ARZOLA

PHYLLIS DIANA ARZOLA

RUPERT D ARZOLA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Dismissal, Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Publication, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Application for Waiver/Deferral, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Waiving Court Costs, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Judgment For: ARIZONA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION Judgment Against: RUPERT D ARZOLA Judgment Against: PHYLLIS DIANA ARZOLA, Amount: $4,686.07, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Judgment For: ARIZONA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION Judgment Against: RUPERT D ARZOLA Judgment Against: PHYLLIS DIANA ARZOLA, Amount: $36.88, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Judgment For: ARIZONA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION Judgment Against: RUPERT D ARZOLA Judgment Against: PHYLLIS DIANA ARZOLA, Amount: $400.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Judgment For: ARIZONA FEDERAL CREDIT UNION Judgment Against: RUPERT D ARZOLA Judgment Against: PHYLLIS DIANA ARZOLA, Amount: $366.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less