This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/30/2019 at 05:07:07 (UTC).

AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF TRUCING, INC. VS JIMMY SUAREZ

Case Summary

On 10/02/2017 AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF TRUCING, INC filed an Other lawsuit against JIMMY SUAREZ. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5460

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF TRUCING, INC.

Defendant

JIMMY SUAREZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Certificate of Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Judgment For: AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF TRUCING, INC. Judgment Against: JIMMY SUAREZ, Amount: $3,203.00, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Judgment For: AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF TRUCING, INC. Judgment Against: JIMMY SUAREZ, Amount: $217.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less