Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/19/2019 at 01:35:37 (UTC).

ADRIAN ROSS VS VALLEY INCOME PROPERTIES

Case Summary

On 01/30/2017 ADRIAN ROSS filed an Other lawsuit against VALLEY INCOME PROPERTIES. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9726

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADRIAN ROSS

Defendant

VALLEY INCOME PROPERTIES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Mark Zinman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Set Aside, Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Set Aside, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Set Aside, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Ruling on Motion, Sub Type: Continue Hearing, Result: Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Response, Sub Type: To Motion, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Continue Hearing, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Defendant, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Attorneys Fees, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Joint ADR Statement, Sub Type: No Settlement Reached, Result: Plaintiff Failed to Appear

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Transfer From Small Claims to Civil, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer and Counterclaim, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Certified/Registered Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Summons, Sub Type: Issued, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Judgment For: VALLEY INCOME PROPERTIES Judgment Against: ADRIAN ROSS, Amount: $495.00, Type: Damages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Judgment For: VALLEY INCOME PROPERTIES Judgment Against: ADRIAN ROSS, Amount: $920.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • Judgment For: VALLEY INCOME PROPERTIES Judgment Against: ADRIAN ROSS, Amount: $65.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less