Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/30/2019 at 09:58:52 (UTC).

ACCION NEW MEXICO-ARIZONA-COLORADO VS KIMBERLY STROKES Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2017 ACCION NEW MEXICO-ARIZONA-COLORADO filed an Other lawsuit against KIMBERLY STROKES. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1645

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACCION NEW MEXICO-ARIZONA-COLORADO

Defendants

KIMBERLY STROKES

FLYBOYZZ CLOTHING STORE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Marc Gladner

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Affidavit in Support of Attorney Fees, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • Judgment For: ACCION NEW MEXICO-ARIZONA-COLORADO Judgment Against: KIMBERLY STROKES Judgment Against: FLYBOYZZ CLOTHING STORE LLC, Amount: $6,383.25, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • Judgment For: ACCION NEW MEXICO-ARIZONA-COLORADO Judgment Against: KIMBERLY STROKES Judgment Against: FLYBOYZZ CLOTHING STORE LLC, Amount: $256.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • Judgment For: ACCION NEW MEXICO-ARIZONA-COLORADO Judgment Against: KIMBERLY STROKES Judgment Against: FLYBOYZZ CLOTHING STORE LLC, Amount: $440.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less