Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/17/2019 at 01:44:28 (UTC).

AAA FULL TRANSPORTATION, INC., an Arizona Corporation VS WHITE PATNERSHIPS i-V Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/29/2016 AAA FULL TRANSPORTATION, INC , an Arizona Corporation filed an Other lawsuit against WHITE PATNERSHIPS i-V. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6020

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AAA FULL TRANSPORTATION, INC., an Arizona Corporation

AAA FULL TRANSPORTATION, INC.

Defendants

WHITE PATNERSHIPS i-V

BLACK CORPORATIONS i-V

Donald Conway Widham

Timothy Spencer Ghersi

Rachel Dreyfuss

Donald Conway Windham, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Byrl Lane

Defendant Attorney

Jennifer Elias

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Dismissal, Result: Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Stipulation, Sub Type: Dismiss, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Settlement, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Continue, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Continue Hearing, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Continue Hearing, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Continue, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Jury, Sub Type: Demand, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less