This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 07/07/2020 at 09:36:49 (UTC).

AAA Auto Title Loans VS Atoria Collier

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 AAA Auto Title Loans filed an Other lawsuit against Atoria Collier. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7179

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AAA Auto Title Loans

Defendant

Atoria Collier

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Summons, Sub Type: Issued, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less