This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/01/2019 at 07:08:18 (UTC).

AAA AUTO TITLE LOANS LLC VS JOSEPH SALGADO

Case Summary

On 12/26/2017 AAA AUTO TITLE LOANS LLC filed an Other lawsuit against JOSEPH SALGADO. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Arrowhead Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Wismer, Craig. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5189

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arrowhead Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Wismer, Craig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AAA AUTO TITLE LOANS LLC

Defendant

JOSEPH SALGADO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Returned Mail, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Alternative Method of Service, Result: Summons Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order of Transfer, Sub Type: Civil Division, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Alternative Service, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Transfer From Small Claims to Civil, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Authorization to Represent, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • Judgment For: AAA AUTO TITLE LOANS LLC Judgment Against: JOSEPH SALGADO, Amount: $886.19, Type: Total Judgment, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less