Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/16/2019 at 03:27:44 (UTC).

AAA AUTO TITLE LOANS LLC VS JESUS GOMEZ

Case Summary

On 10/24/2016 AAA AUTO TITLE LOANS LLC filed an Other lawsuit against JESUS GOMEZ. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2011

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AAA AUTO TITLE LOANS LLC

Defendant

JESUS GOMEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Suspending Action Due to Bankruptcy, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Filing of Bankruptcy, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Change of Address, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Judgment For: AAA AUTO TITLE LOANS LLC Judgment Against: JESUS GOMEZ, Amount: $1,091.96, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Judgment For: AAA AUTO TITLE LOANS LLC Judgment Against: JESUS GOMEZ, Amount: $299.41, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • Judgment For: AAA AUTO TITLE LOANS LLC Judgment Against: JESUS GOMEZ, Amount: $308.75, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less