This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 07:48:27 (UTC).

AAA AUTO TITLE LOANS, LLC VS GILBERT ROMO

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 AAA AUTO TITLE LOANS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against GILBERT ROMO. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are Medina Ochoa, Enrique and Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7555

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

Medina Ochoa, Enrique

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AAA AUTO TITLE LOANS, LLC

Defendant

GILBERT ROMO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Change of Address, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Judgment For: AAA AUTO TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: GILBERT ROMO II, Amount: $382.15, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Judgment For: AAA AUTO TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: GILBERT ROMO II, Amount: $1,363.52, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • Judgment For: AAA AUTO TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: GILBERT ROMO II, Amount: $172.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less