This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/29/2019 at 08:12:04 (UTC).

AAA Auto Title Loans, LLC VS Edward Vigil

Case Summary

On 08/23/2017 AAA Auto Title Loans, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Edward Vigil. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, University Lakes Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Kissell, Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7847

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    University Lakes Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Kissell, Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AAA Auto Title Loans, LLC

Defendant

Edward Vigil

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Judgment For: AAA Auto Title Loans, LLC Judgment Against: Edward Vigil, Amount: $389.20, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Judgment For: AAA Auto Title Loans, LLC Judgment Against: Edward Vigil, Amount: $805.88, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • Judgment For: AAA Auto Title Loans, LLC Judgment Against: Edward Vigil, Amount: $112.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less