This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/04/2019 at 08:25:52 (UTC).

A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC VS TINEESHA ROEBUCK

Case Summary

On 01/04/2018 A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against TINEESHA ROEBUCK. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2995

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC

Defendant

TINEESHA ROEBUCK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Milton Mecham

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Corrective Action Notice Sent, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Moot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Moot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Moot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Publication, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Substitution, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Publication, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Dismissal Without Prejudice, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less