This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/04/2019 at 08:25:40 (UTC).

A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC VS SERGE BALLOU

Case Summary

On 01/04/2018 A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against SERGE BALLOU. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2990

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC

Defendant

SERGE BALLOU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Milton Mecham

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Debtor, Sub Type: Hearing Request, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Non Exempt Earnings Statement, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: And Order, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Minute Entry Issued, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Notice of Hearing on Garnishment, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Comprehensive Pre Trial Conf Hearing, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Waiving Court Costs, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Waiver/Deferral, Sub Type: Application for Waiver/Deferral, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Judgment For: A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: SERGE BALLOU, Amount: $681.88, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Judgment For: A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: SERGE BALLOU, Amount: $312.97, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Judgment For: A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: SERGE BALLOU, Amount: $750.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Judgment For: A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: SERGE BALLOU, Amount: $140.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less