Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/10/2019 at 19:58:02 (UTC).

A Speedy Cash Car Title Loans, LLC VS Lanitta Blade

Case Summary

On 04/26/2016 A Speedy Cash Car Title Loans, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Lanitta Blade. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4421

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A Speedy Cash Car Title Loans, LLC

Defendant

Lanitta Blade

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Milton Mecham

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Publication, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Publication, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Judgment For: A Speedy Cash Car Title Loans, LLC Judgment Against: Lanitta Blade, Amount: $661.27, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Judgment For: A Speedy Cash Car Title Loans, LLC Judgment Against: Lanitta Blade, Amount: $296.75, Type: Accrual

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Judgment For: A Speedy Cash Car Title Loans, LLC Judgment Against: Lanitta Blade, Amount: $500.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Judgment For: A Speedy Cash Car Title Loans, LLC Judgment Against: Lanitta Blade, Amount: $211.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less