This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/09/2019 at 01:24:35 (UTC).

A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC VS JO SIAH BAILEY

Case Summary

On 03/09/2016 A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against JO SIAH BAILEY. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3208

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC

Defendants

JO SIAH BAILEY

Josiah Bailey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Milton Mecham

J Andersen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order to Show Cause Re Garnishees Default, Result: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order to Show Cause Re Garnishees Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition for Order To Show Cause Re Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Judgment For: A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: Josiah Bailey, Amount: $754.60, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Judgment For: A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: Josiah Bailey, Amount: $349.86, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Judgment For: A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: Josiah Bailey, Amount: $500.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Judgment For: A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: Josiah Bailey, Amount: $139.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less