This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/30/2019 at 12:25:22 (UTC).

A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC VS GEORGE PINEDA LA BRIE

Case Summary

On 10/13/2017 A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against GEORGE PINEDA LA BRIE. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4407

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC

Defendant

GEORGE PINEDA LA BRIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Milton Mecham

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Substitution, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Publication, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Publication, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Judgment For: A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: GEORGE PINEDA LA BRIE, Amount: $536.00, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Judgment For: A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: GEORGE PINEDA LA BRIE, Amount: $500.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Judgment For: A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: GEORGE PINEDA LA BRIE, Amount: $269.57, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Judgment For: A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: GEORGE PINEDA LA BRIE, Amount: $177.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less