This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/04/2019 at 08:25:55 (UTC).

A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC VS GENEVIEVE JIMMY

Case Summary

On 01/04/2018 A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against GENEVIEVE JIMMY. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Downtown Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Medina, Enrique. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2996

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Medina, Enrique

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC

Defendant

GENEVIEVE JIMMY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Milton Mecham

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Substitution, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Publication, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Publication, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Judgment For: A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: GENEVIEVE JIMMY, Amount: $442.96, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Judgment For: A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: GENEVIEVE JIMMY, Amount: $222.81, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Judgment For: A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: GENEVIEVE JIMMY, Amount: $212.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Judgment For: A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC Judgment Against: GENEVIEVE JIMMY, Amount: $500.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less