This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/19/2019 at 09:35:39 (UTC).

A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC. VS Bisa Santos Windley

Case Summary

On 02/10/2017 A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Bisa Santos Windley. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7353

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC.

Defendant

Bisa Santos Windley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Milton Mecham

J Andersen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Substitution, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Publication, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Publication, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Judgment For: A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC. Judgment Against: Bisa Santos Windley, Amount: $614.72, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Judgment For: A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC. Judgment Against: Bisa Santos Windley, Amount: $254.64, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Judgment For: A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC. Judgment Against: Bisa Santos Windley, Amount: $500.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2017
  • Judgment For: A SPEEDY CASH CAR TITLE LOANS, LLC. Judgment Against: Bisa Santos Windley, Amount: $211.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less