This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 11/05/2019 at 06:53:18 (UTC).

A Speedy Cash Car Title Loans, LLC VS Amber Ness

Case Summary

On 02/12/2018 A Speedy Cash Car Title Loans, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Amber Ness. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8847

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A Speedy Cash Car Title Loans, LLC

Defendant

Amber Ness

Garnishee

VCA ANIMAL HOSPITALS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Milton Mecham

J Andersen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Bankruptcy, Sub Type: Discharge, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Filing of Bankruptcy, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Suspending Action Due to Bankruptcy, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Filing of Bankruptcy, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Certificate of Service, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Appear Telephonically, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Counsel, Sub Type: Notice of Substitution, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Publication, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Publication, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Judgment For: A Speedy Cash Car Title Loans, LLC Judgment Against: Amber Ness, Amount: $962.00, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Judgment For: A Speedy Cash Car Title Loans, LLC Judgment Against: Amber Ness, Amount: $100.29, Type: Interest

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Judgment For: A Speedy Cash Car Title Loans, LLC Judgment Against: Amber Ness, Amount: $500.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Judgment For: A Speedy Cash Car Title Loans, LLC Judgment Against: Amber Ness, Amount: $177.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.