Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/18/2019 at 07:50:31 (UTC).

A-L FINANCIAL CORP VS LISET AVILA Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2017 A-L FINANCIAL CORP filed an Other lawsuit against LISET AVILA. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0673

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L FINANCIAL CORP

Defendants

LISET AVILA

DANIEL A AVILA AVELAR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Subpoena Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Subpoena Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Subpoena duces tecum, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Subpoena duces tecum, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: JDE Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: JDE Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Petition, Sub Type: Request for Supplemental Proceedings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Petition, Sub Type: Request for Supplemental Proceedings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • Judgment For: A-L FINANCIAL CORP Judgment Against: DANIEL A AVILA AVELAR Judgment Against: LISET AVILA, Amount: $10,295.99, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less