Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/15/2019 at 01:19:57 (UTC).

A-L FINANCIAL CORP VS ARMIDA GATICA

Case Summary

On 09/19/2016 A-L FINANCIAL CORP filed an Other lawsuit against ARMIDA GATICA. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8262

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Dreamy Draw Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L FINANCIAL CORP

Defendant

ARMIDA GATICA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order Discharging Garnishee, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: JDE Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Appearance and Directing Service (JDE), Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Pending Dismissal of Lawsuit, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Judgment For: A-L FINANCIAL CORP Judgment Against: ARMIDA GATICA, Amount: $2,982.49, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • Judgment For: A-L FINANCIAL CORP Judgment Against: ARMIDA GATICA, Amount: $122.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less