Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/14/2019 at 14:43:40 (UTC).

6635 N 19th Ave, Inc VS Cynthia Herson

Case Summary

On 09/02/2016 6635 N 19th Ave, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Cynthia Herson. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Encanto Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judges overseeing this case are McMurry, C. Steven and Cheuvront, Ken. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7309

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Encanto Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judges

McMurry, C. Steven

Cheuvront, Ken

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

6635 N 19th Ave, Inc

Defendant

Cynthia Herson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew Hull

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Statement of Costs, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: For Plaintiff, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Appeal Notice of, Sub Type: Final Disposition, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Record of Proceedings, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Transmittal of Record to Superior Court, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Appeal Transmittal of Record, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Appeal Notice of, Sub Type: Initial Perfection, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Appellee, Sub Type: Memoranda Response, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Minute Entry Issued, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Bond, Sub Type: Bond Worksheet, Result: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Appeal Notice of, Sub Type: Right to Appeal, Result: Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Subpoena for Witness, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Court Date, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Events: Event Type: App/Deferral/Costs/Fees/Ser, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Eviction Action Complaint, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2016
  • Judgment For: 6635 N 19th Ave, Inc Judgment Against: Cynthia Herson, Amount: $1,780.31, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Judgment For: 6635 N 19th Ave, Inc Judgment Against: Cynthia Herson, Amount: $1,325.00, Type: Attorney Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Judgment For: 6635 N 19th Ave, Inc Judgment Against: Cynthia Herson, Amount: $364.65, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less