This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 10/30/2019 at 16:33:29 (UTC).

1 STOP MONEY CENTERS, LLC VS MICHAEL SHAWN RUSSELL

Case Summary

On 10/20/2017 1 STOP MONEY CENTERS, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MICHAEL SHAWN RUSSELL. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Agua Fria Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Guzman, Joe. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9048

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Agua Fria Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Guzman, Joe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

1 STOP MONEY CENTERS, LLC

Defendant

MICHAEL SHAWN RUSSELL

Garnishee

ENGLUND EQUIPMENT COMPANY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Release Of Garnishee, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment, Sub Type: Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Order Signed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Order of Continuing Lien, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Summons Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Application for Writ of Garnishment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Judgment Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Events: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • Events: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Judgment For: 1 STOP MONEY CENTERS, LLC Judgment Against: MICHAEL SHAWN RUSSELL, Amount: $2,033.35, Type: Total Judgment, Status: Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less