This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 01/11/2023 at 08:20:34 (UTC).

Parkside Apartments VS Florentina Vo Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/30/2021 Parkside Apartments filed an Other lawsuit against Florentina Vo. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, University Lakes Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Kissell, Tyler. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3897

  • Filing Date:

    03/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Kissell, Tyler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Parkside Apartments

Defendants

Florentina Vo

Jose Guevara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J Heldenbrand

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Imaged Case File; Result: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Writ; Sub Type: Restitution; Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Writ; Sub Type: Restitution; Result: Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Writ; Sub Type: Restitution; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • HearingEvent: Eviction Action Hearing; Result: Judgment Entered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Undesignated; Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Judgment; Sub Type: Undesignated; Result: Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Minute Entry Issued; Result: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: Parkside Apartments; Judgement Against: Florentina Vo Judgement Against: Jose Guevara; Amount: $831.38; Type: Rent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: Parkside Apartments; Judgement Against: Florentina Vo Judgement Against: Jose Guevara; Amount: $70.00; Type: Late Charge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: Parkside Apartments; Judgement Against: Florentina Vo Judgement Against: Jose Guevara; Amount: $110.00; Type: Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: Parkside Apartments; Judgement Against: Florentina Vo Judgement Against: Jose Guevara; Amount: $100.00; Type: Attorney Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Affidavit of Service; Sub Type: Private Process; Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • HearingEvent Type: Complaint; Sub Type: Eviction Action Complaint; Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less