Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 06/12/2021 at 11:58:21 (UTC).

MARJORIE A PETRUCCI Et Al VS NIKKI KRUM

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 MARJORIE A PETRUCCI filed an Other lawsuit against NIKKI KRUM. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Jones, Kyle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4170

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Jones, Kyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SUZANN L PETRUCCI

MARJORIE A PETRUCCI

Defendant

NIKKI KRUM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark Tucker

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Document Received, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Letter, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Returned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • HearingEvent: Eviction Action Hearing; Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Undesignated, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Minute Entry Issued, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: SUZANN L PETRUCCI Judgment For: MARJORIE A PETRUCCI Judgment Against: NIKKI KRUM, Amount: $1,573.00, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less