This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 08/13/2022 at 10:15:58 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS PAMELA SAVAGE

Case Summary

On 10/07/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against PAMELA SAVAGE. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Dreamy Draw Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Conti, Frank. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1614

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Conti, Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

PAMELA SAVAGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rhett Flaming-Buschman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Stipulated, Result: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Pleadings, Result: No Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • JudgementJudgment For: LVNV FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: PAMELA SAVAGE, Amount: $787.87, Type: Principal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • JudgementJudgment For: LVNV FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: PAMELA SAVAGE, Amount: $176.00, Type: Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • JudgementJudgment For: LVNV FUNDING LLC Judgment Against: PAMELA SAVAGE, Amount: ($150.00), Type: Offset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Stipulation and Order of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • HearingEvent: Mediation; Result: Stipulated Judgment and Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Mediation, Sub Type: Outcome Notice, Result: Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Undesignated, Result: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Waive Appearance of Real Party in Interest, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Judgment on Pleadings, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Setting Mediation, Result: Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Disclosure Statement, Sub Type: Notice of Service Re 26.1 Disclosure, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Complaint, Sub Type: Amended Complaint, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Answer, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Defendant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less