This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 01/30/2023 at 11:56:37 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS MARCOS GARCIA

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MARCOS GARCIA. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Kyrene Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Sauls, Sharron. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1118

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Sauls, Sharron

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MARCOS GARCIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rhett Flaming-Buschman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Judgment; Sub Type: Default; Result: Default Judgment And Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: LVNV FUNDING LLC; Judgement Against: MARCOS GARCIA; Amount: $1,251.60; Type: Principal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: LVNV FUNDING LLC; Judgement Against: MARCOS GARCIA; Amount: $0.00; Type: Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: LVNV FUNDING LLC; Judgement Against: MARCOS GARCIA; Amount: $0.00; Type: Attorney Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: LVNV FUNDING LLC; Judgement Against: MARCOS GARCIA; Amount: $176.00; Type: Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: LVNV FUNDING LLC; Judgement Against: MARCOS GARCIA; Amount: $0.00; Type: Offset

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Document Received; Sub Type: Undesignated; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Request; Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Application for Entry of Default; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Affidavit of Service; Sub Type: Post/Mail; Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Order; Sub Type: Extend Time for Service; Result: Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Order; Sub Type: Alternative Service; Result: Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Order; Sub Type: Alternative Service; Result: Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Notice; Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service; Result: Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion; Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Motion; Sub Type: Alternative Service; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less