This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 03/12/2022 at 01:42:33 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS JOSE MIER

Case Summary

On 03/17/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against JOSE MIER. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, White Tank Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Owens, Heidi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5780

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Owens, Heidi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JOSE MIER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rhett Flaming-Buschman

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Dismiss Lack of Service, Result: Dismissed Without Prejudice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Order, Sub Type: Extend Time for Service, Result: Signed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Motion, Sub Type: Extension of Time to Serve, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Notice, Sub Type: Dismissal for Lack of Service, Result: Mailed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less