Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 04/13/2021 at 13:27:47 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS JOEL R ASIRSAN

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 DISCOVER BANK filed an Other lawsuit against JOEL R ASIRSAN. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, East Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Russell, Keith. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5971

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Russell, Keith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

JOEL R ASIRSAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Guglielmo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Stipulated, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: DISCOVER BANK Judgment Against: JOEL R ASIRSAN, Amount: $3,899.02, Type: Principal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: DISCOVER BANK Judgment Against: JOEL R ASIRSAN, Amount: $151.00, Type: Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Stipulation and Order of Judgment, Result: Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Proof of Debt, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less