This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 01/30/2023 at 12:47:19 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK VS ADAM GORDON

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 DISCOVER BANK filed an Other lawsuit against ADAM GORDON. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Mesa Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Jones, Kyle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1885

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Jones, Kyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

ADAM GORDON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Guglielmo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Judgment; Sub Type: Default; Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: DISCOVER BANK; Judgement Against: ADAM GORDON; Amount: $6,409.76; Type: Total Judgment

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Statement of Costs; Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Request; Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment; Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Affidavit of Service; Sub Type: Private Process; Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Application for Entry of Default; Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Affidavit of Service; Sub Type: Private Process; Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less