This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 03/11/2022 at 21:41:30 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) VS NIKKI NIELSEN

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 CAPITAL ONE BANK USA filed an Other lawsuit against NIKKI NIELSEN. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1474

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA)

Defendant

NIKKI NIELSEN

Garnishee

WAL-MART INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd Gurstel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishment Creditor, Sub Type: Petition Discharging Garnishee, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Satisfaction Of Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Garnishee, Sub Type: Answer (Earnings), Result: Received

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Garnishment Return, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Garnishment Earnings, Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) Judgment Against: NIKKI NIELSEN, Amount: $2,689.49, Type: Total Judgment, Status: Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Complaint, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less