This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 01/05/2023 at 20:48:17 (UTC).

CAMELBACK FINANCE, INC VS CARLOS JOVANY HERNANDEZ

Case Summary

On 09/02/2022 CAMELBACK FINANCE, INC filed an Other lawsuit against CARLOS JOVANY HERNANDEZ. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, West Mcdowell Justice Court located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Ramirez Lopez, Teresa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1965

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Ramirez Lopez, Teresa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMELBACK FINANCE, INC

Defendant

CARLOS JOVANY HERNANDEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Judgment; Sub Type: Default; Result: Issued/Ordered

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: CAMELBACK FINANCE, INC; Judgement Against: CARLOS JOVANY HERNANDEZ; Amount: $9,999.99; Type: Principal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: CAMELBACK FINANCE, INC; Judgement Against: CARLOS JOVANY HERNANDEZ; Amount: $2,401.26; Type: Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • Judgement(F)or / (A)gainst: Judgement For: CAMELBACK FINANCE, INC; Judgement Against: CARLOS JOVANY HERNANDEZ; Amount: $576.00; Type: Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Proof of Debt; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Statement of Costs; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Request; Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • HearingEvent Type: Application for Entry of Default; Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less