Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 06/03/2021 at 10:41:14 (UTC).

BREINHOLT MAY REALTY AND INVESTMENTS VS ALETA GONZALEZ Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 BREINHOLT MAY REALTY AND INVESTMENTS filed an Other lawsuit against ALETA GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, North Mesa Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Jones, Kyle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4343

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Mesa Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Jones, Kyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BREINHOLT MAY REALTY AND INVESTMENTS

Defendants

BARBARA STINSON

BRUCE SHANE

ALETA GONZALEZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Writ, Sub Type: Restitution, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • HearingEvent: Eviction Action Hearing; Result: Default Judgment And Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: BREINHOLT MAY REALTY AND INVESTMENTS Judgment Against: BARBARA STINSON Judgment Against: ALETA GONZALEZ, Amount: $2,591.00, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Post/Mail, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less