Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Maricopa County Justice Courts on 06/19/2021 at 22:16:44 (UTC).

AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES INC VS ATORIA CELESTE COLLIER

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES INC filed an Other lawsuit against ATORIA CELESTE COLLIER. This case was filed in Maricopa County Justice Courts, Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse located in Maricopa, Arizona. The Judge overseeing this case is Riggs, Cathy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4106

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Maricopa County Justice Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Desert Ridge Justice Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Maricopa, Arizona

Judge Details

Judge

Riggs, Cathy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

Defendant

ATORIA CELESTE COLLIER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Judgment, Sub Type: Default, Result: Issued/Ordered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • JudgementJudgment For: AUTO NOW FINANCIAL SERVICES INC Judgment Against: ATORIA CELESTE COLLIER, Amount: $8,694.46, Type: Total Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Request, Sub Type: Affidavit for Entry of Default Judgment, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Application for Entry of Default, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Affidavit of Service, Sub Type: Private Process, Result: Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • HearingEvents: Event Type: Complaint, Sub Type: Civil Complaint, Result: Filed by Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less